Macdonald, David Blair (CPSO#: 77099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, CPCR L2119
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78571
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

499 Raglan Street, North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Blair Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macdonald ( CPSO# 77099 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
CPCR 2121
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8212

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8212

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8212

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 737-8212

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BLAIR MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003