Macdonald, Denis Francis (CPSO#: 31515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9N 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416 480 4042
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macdonald ( CPSO# 31515 )

Business Address:
Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIS FRANCIS MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1980