Macdonald, Elinor Athen (CPSO#: 32320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Outpatient Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3362
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Macdonald & E.A. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Macdonald ( CPSO# 32320 )
Dr. C. Macdonald ( CPSO# 33798 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELINOR ATHEN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1981