Macdonald, Jillian Alexandra (CPSO#: 82743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Clinic
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone: (613) 729-1616
Fax: (613) 729-3838
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mohs Surgery Unit, 4th Floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4069
Fax: 613-761-4194
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jillian Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacDonald ( CPSO# 82743 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Clinic
Suite 200
343 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 1N4
Phone Number: (613) 729-1616

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN ALEXANDRA MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2011