Macdonald, John Cameron (CPSO#: 17803)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor Radiology Associates 1550 Ouellette Ave Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Date Received: 16 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Mar 1973
Summary:

 In March 1973, the Discipline Committee found Dr. MacDonald guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he charged OHIP for services not rendered.  The Committee subsequently ordered his licence to 
 be suspended for one month.

Appeal: Decision Upheld
Appeal Decision Date: 18 Apr 1975
Hearing Date(s): 16 Mar 1973