Macdonald, John Charles (CPSO#: 68234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macdonald ( CPSO# 68234 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Dec 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2003 to 14 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2004 to 14 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2005 to 14 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2006 to 14 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996