Macdonald, Joseph Gerard (CPSO#: 45208)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 1990