Macdonald, Kathryn Jean (CPSO#: 66549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1745 Chiefswood Road
Ohsweken ON  N0A 1M0
Phone: (519) 445-2143
Fax: (519) 445-0504
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Family Health Team
123 James St North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 667-4847
Fax: (905) 667-4873
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-3030
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN JEAN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1999