Macdonald, Michael Rainey (CPSO#: 59522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 430
500 Sutter Street
San Francisco CA  94102
United States
Phone: (415) 956-3223
Fax: (416) 956-3210

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL RAINEY MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989