Macdonald, Nora Elizabeth (CPSO#: 28728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2004