Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Macdonald, Peter Benjamin (CPSO#: 62698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1991