Macdonald, Peter Shaun (CPSO#: 63951)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2001