Macdonald, Richard John (CPSO#: 55747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 318
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905)-338-8303
Fax: (905) 815-9528
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1987