Macdonald, Robert Gene (CPSO#: 17491)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995