Macdonald, Robert Loughlin (CPSO#: 55897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5452
Fax: (416) 864-5634
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Loch Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LOUGHLIN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1992 to 31 Mar 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006