Macdougall, Lorna Jean (CPSO#: 57310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 208
4318 County Road 124
Nottawa ON  L0M 1P0
Phone: (705) 888-6564
Fax: (888) 446-8614
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorna J. MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Macdougall ( CPSO# 57310 )

Business Address:
4318 County Road 124
PO Box 208
Ottawa ON  L0M 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 888-6564

Business Address:
Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
GBHS - Meaford Site
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNA JEAN MACDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987