Macdougall, Peter Lee Robert (CPSO#: 51065)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2012