Mace, Sean Richard (CPSO#: 69498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 264-4443
Fax: (416) 264-1804
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 350
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Canada
Phone: (705) 945-0166
Fax: (705) 945-8739
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean R. Mace Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mace ( CPSO# 69498 )
Dr. S. Done ( CPSO# 69486 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 264-4443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN RICHARD MACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1995