Maceachern, Mary Shauna (CPSO#: 66262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206
Robertson Road
Nepean ON  K2H1A5
Phone: (613) 596-0911
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY SHAUNA MACEACHERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACEACHERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1993