Macfadyen Jr, Bruce Vischer (CPSO#: 58648)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hahnemann Medical College, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Sep 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1988