Macgregor, Daune Lorine (CPSO#: 25020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAUNE LORINE MACGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977