Macgregor, Donald Gordon (CPSO#: 42237)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1988