Machado de Oliveira, Lais (CPSO#: 111276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 28 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Neurology
Movement Disorders Research Centre
399 Bathurst Street McL 7 413
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAIS MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MACHADO DE OLIVEIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 01 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2017 to 27 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2018