Machat, Jeffery Joseph Jackob (CPSO#: 56822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crystal Clear Vision
Unit H-100
33 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2E3
Phone: (416) 928-0777
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY JOSEPH JACKOB MACHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987