Machnowska, Matylda Hanna (CPSO#: 92153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 57221 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Matylda Machnowska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Dept of Medical Imaging
AG31B
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATYLDA HANNA MACHNOWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACHNOWSKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013