Machold, Clea Alexandra (CPSO#: 112587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PEAP - Resident as of 29 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 470-3030
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEA ALEXANDRA MACHOLD may practise medicine only:

(a) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the McMaster University to which the holder is appointed, and only as part of a system in which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the program to that clinical teaching unit;

(b) to the extent required to complete the Pre-entry Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(c) under a level of supervision that is determined to be appropriate for the holder and the program of medical education and assessment, by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the program.

(2) Dr. MACHOLD may not charge a fee for medical services.

(3) This certificate expires when Dr. MACHOLD is no longer enrolled in the Pre-entry Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1), which may be no more than twelve weeks in duration.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 Aug 2017 and expires on 31 Dec 2017, or when Dr. MACHOLD's enrolment in the Pre-entry Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2017 to 12 Feb 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 13 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017