Macie, Christine Marie Greco (CPSO#: 73546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 623-2366
Fax: (519) 623-3036
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine M. Macie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Macie ( CPSO# 73546 )

Business Address:
10 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (519) 623-2366

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE GRECO MACIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004