Macintosh, Frank Douglas (CPSO#: 27227)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017