Macintyre, John (CPSO#: 21233)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1994