Mack, David Ross (CPSO#: 52904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2516
Fax: (613) 738-4854
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROSS MACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2001