Mackay, Harold Vernon (CPSO#: 16941)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2003