Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mackay, Hugh Colin (CPSO#: 66647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1745 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K6
Phone: (613) 945-6827
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH COLIN MACKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995