Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mackay, Margaret Jane (CPSO#: 64104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2712 Ashridge Place
Oakville ON  L6J 7K3
Phone: (905) 829-9908
Fax: (905) 829-9464
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET JANE MACKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992