Mackay, Robert Douglas Shane (CPSO#: 54121)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Berkeley Therapy Institute 1749 Martin Luther King Junior Way Berkeley CA 94709 United States Phone: (510) 540-1746
Date Received: 02 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2015