Macken, Sheila Rosemary (CPSO#: 51068)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1996