Mackenzie, Brian Mark (CPSO#: 51069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: (705) 775-6869
Fax: (705) 775-6868
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian M. MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 51069 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 775-6869

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MARK MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983