Mackenzie, Ian Reid Alexander (CPSO#: 54349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept. of Pathology & Laboratory
Medicine, Section of Neuropathology
Vancouver General Hospital
855 West 12th Avenue
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604) 875-4480
Fax: (604) 875-5707

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN REID ALEXANDER MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987