Mackenzie, Jennifer Jane (CPSO#: 59656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Mcmaster Childrens Hospital
3N11c-J
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-2651
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

169 Pine St. S
Timmins ON  P4N 8B7
Canada
Phone: 7052671181
Fax: 7052643980
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 59656 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Porcupine Health Unit
169 Pine Street South
Timmins ON  P4N 8B7
Phone Number: (705) 743-1000

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
Room 3N11-G
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
North Bay Health Unit
681 Commercial Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4E7
Phone Number: (705) 474-1400

Business Address:
KGH
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER JANE MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989