Mackenzie, John (CPSO#: 19085)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1987