Mackenzie, Robert Arthur (CPSO#: 19725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1599 Hillside Drive
London ON  N6G 2P7
Phone: (519) 642-2139
Fax: (519) 642-4381
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Constance A. Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 84222 )
Dr. R. Mackenzie ( CPSO# 19725 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B2-047
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6065

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  August  2,  2014,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Robert  Arthur
            Mackenzie, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mackenzie
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Mackenzie may  not  engage in any area of medical practice other than
                  nuclear medicine in a hospital  setting.   In  this practice, he may read
                  and report on ECGs related to stress tests (but not other studies such as
                  ultrasounds, venous or arterial studies), and will  not  sign  off on any
                  ECG report until he has reviewed it to ensure its accuracy.
                  
                  
            As  from September 27, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition  and
            limitation  on  the  certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr. Robert Arthur
            Mackenzie, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mackenzie
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Mackenzie  has  voluntarily relinquished his prescribing  privileges
                  with respect to the following  drugs, substances and preparations set out
                  in the corresponding regulations,  as  amended  from  time  to  time, and
                  summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X