Mackenzie, Terence Anthony (CPSO#: 25273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Nov 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2013