Mackenzie, Victor Paul (CPSO#: 20957)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012