Mackett, Robert Laurence (CPSO#: 51072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Queenston Street
Suite 200A
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 688-4804
Fax: (905) 688-4808
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LAURENCE MACKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987