Mackey, Shannon Richard (CPSO#: 93691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Document Storage 1-888-563-3732
Instructions: Contact after July 15 to obtain records
Date Received: 15 Jun 2017


Instructions: Patients wishing to obtain copies of their medical records should contact Dr. Mackey at 647-344-4553
Date Received: 19 Jun 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2017