Mackie, Christopher Alexander Oulton (CPSO#: 83849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex London Health Unit
50 King Street
London ON  N6A 5L7
Phone: (519) 663-5317 Ext. 2444
Fax: (519) 663-9413
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER OULTON MACKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Nov 2005 to 16 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007