Mackillop, William Jeffrey (CPSO#: 32028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Ctr Of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Attn: Mavis Livingstone
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4144
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Mackillop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JEFFREY MACKILLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKILLOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1980