Mackinnon, Frederick Neil (CPSO#: 54239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2422
Fax: (519) 749-4208
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6587 Ext. 6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK NEIL MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986