Mackinnon, Laura Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Manitou Cr W
Amherstview ON  K7N 1S3
Phone: (613) 389-1604
Fax: (613) 384-7359
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1993