Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mackintosh, Alasdair John (CPSO#: 54258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apple Hills Medical Association
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone: (905) 625-1241
Fax: (905) 625-9514
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.J. Mackintosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackintosh ( CPSO# 54258 )
Dr. D. Mackintosh ( CPSO# 54182 )

Business Address:
Apple Hills Medical Association
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone Number: (905) 625-1241

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALASDAIR JOHN MACKINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1986