Mackintosh, Deirdre Mary (CPSO#: 54182)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Tighe, Deirdre Mary (used until: 17 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.J. Mackintosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackintosh ( CPSO# 54258 )
Dr. D. Mackintosh ( CPSO# 54182 )

Business Address:
Apple Hills Medical Association
1221 Bloor Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2N8
Phone Number: (905) 625-1241

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Nov 1986
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017